This case was last updated from Wayne County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 09:58:05 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC V ESTATE OF RICHARD GAINFORT ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ESTATE OF RICHARD GAINFORT. This case was filed in Wayne County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6146

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Wayne, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

ESTATE OF RICHARD GAINFORT

USA

DOE JANE

NYS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

DOE JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM HEIRS AT LARGE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM HEIRS AT LARGE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/12/2020; Received: 10/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/12/2020; Received: 10/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS MAILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/12/2020; Received: 10/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS MAILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS USA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS USA; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/28/2020; Received: 09/28/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NYS DEPT. OF TAX

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NYS DEPT. OF TAX; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/28/2020; Received: 09/28/2020

AFFIRMATION Notice of Commencement

AFFIRMATION Notice of Commencement; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 09/17/2020; Received: 09/17/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 09/17/2020; Received: 09/17/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 09/17/2020; Received: 09/17/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 09/17/2020; Received: 09/17/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM HEIRS AT LARGE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/12/2020; Received: 10/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/12/2020; Received: 10/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS MAILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/12/2020; Received: 10/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS MAILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS USA; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/09/2020; Received: 10/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/28/2020; Received: 09/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NYS DEPT. OF TAX; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/28/2020; Received: 09/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Notice of Commencement; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 09/17/2020; Received: 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 09/17/2020; Received: 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 09/17/2020; Received: 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 09/17/2020; Received: 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less