This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 04:28:35 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC, v. CHARLES J TRUAX et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHARLES J TRUAX. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Rita Connerton. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1230

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Rita Connerton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC,

Defendants

JOHN DOE NUMBER ONE THROUGH JOHN DOE NUMBER TEN

Angel s. Cron A/k/a

A/K/A CHARLES J. TRUAX, JR

Charles J Truax A/K/A CHARLES J. TRUAX, JR

John Doe JOHN DOE NUMBER ONE THROUGH JOHN DOE NUMBER TEN

Angel S Truax A/K/A ANGEL S. CRON

NBT BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNEY, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at Knuckles, Komosinski & Manfro, LLP

KOMOSINSKI, RICHARD F

Attorney at KNUCKLES, KOMOSINSKI, & MANFRO, LLP.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NBT BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NBT BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E CERT OF MERIT

EXHIBIT(S) - E CERT OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTER

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTER; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AOS NBT BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NBT BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E CERT OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTER; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less