Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 16:12:51 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC v. CASEY K RAWLEIGH et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CASEY K RAWLEIGH. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B Wiggins. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********65CV

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendants

Dana Rawleigh

Casey K Rawleigh

Not Yet Classified

FEIN SUCH LAW GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #3) ATTY FEE AFFIRMATION

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #3) ATTY FEE AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #3) REFEREE'S OATH & REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #3) REFEREE'S OATH & REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #3) NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF REFERENCE

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #3) NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF REFERENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #3) ORDER OF REFERENCE

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #3) ORDER OF REFERENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #3) AFF OF REGUALRITY

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #3) AFF OF REGUALRITY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #3) AFF OF AMT DUE

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #3) AFF OF AMT DUE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #3) AFFS OF MAILING 3215(g)

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #3) AFFS OF MAILING 3215(g); Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT DANA RAWLEIGH - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT DANA RAWLEIGH - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DANA RAWLEIGH - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DANA RAWLEIGH - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT CASEY K. RAWLEIGH - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT CASEY K. RAWLEIGH - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CASEY K. RAWLEIGH - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CASEY K. RAWLEIGH - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #3) ATTY FEE AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #3) REFEREE'S OATH & REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #3) NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF REFERENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #3) ORDER OF REFERENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #3) AFF OF REGUALRITY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #3) AFF OF AMT DUE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #3) AFFS OF MAILING 3215(g); Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #3) AFFS OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE - NO DOES - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT DANA RAWLEIGH - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DANA RAWLEIGH - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT CASEY K. RAWLEIGH - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CASEY K. RAWLEIGH - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less