This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 05/01/2020 at 18:44:55 (UTC).

PEDRO PABLO PESANTEZ - v. - 650 MET PARTNERS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 PEDRO PABLO PESANTEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 650 MET PARTNERS, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pedro Pablo Pesantez

Defendants and Petitioners

COUNTYWIDE BUILDERS INC.

650 MET PARTNERS, LLC

ASTRAL WEEKS LLC a/k/a ASTRAL WEEKS DEVELOPMENT LLC

Respondents

CMG IMPROVEMENTS INC

VARGAS SERVICES CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATZ, NOAH R

Defendant Attorneys

REID, AOIFE

MAFFIA, EDOARDO

MARTINE, ANTHONY D.

BIVAS, ARIEL ALBERT

ZECCA, STEVEN D

 

Court Documents

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 04/02/2020; Received: 04/02/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answers

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answers; Filed By: Bivas, A.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons + Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons + Complaint; Filed By: Bivas, A.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bivas, A.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - D Answer; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B County Electric Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B County Electric Agreement; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Kleenoh Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Kleenoh Agreement; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 04/02/2020; Received: 04/02/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Answers; Filed By: Bivas, A.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons + Complaint; Filed By: Bivas, A.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bivas, A.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Answer; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B County Electric Agreement; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Kleenoh Agreement; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third Third-Party Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Maffia, E.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER 650 Met partners, LLC; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less