This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 17:47:35 (UTC).

Pearl Delta Funding, LLC v. Newport COnstruction Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Pearl Delta Funding, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Newport COnstruction Services, Inc. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEARL DELTA FUNDING LLC

Defendants

NEWPORT EQUIPMENT SERVICES LLC

Jeffrey A Sill

NEWPORT CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC

NEWPORT RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VERSTANDIG, JACOB ISRAEL

Attorney at Law Offices of Jacob Verstandig, PLLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Verstandig, J.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Verstandig, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff Affidavit; Filed By: Verstandig, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Verstandig, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Verstandig, J.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Verstandig, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Plaintiff Affidavit; Filed By: Verstandig, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Verstandig, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less