This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:27:35 (UTC).

PEARL DELTA FUNDING, LLC v. DANIEL PERALTA et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 PEARL DELTA FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL PERALTA. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEARL DELTA FUNDING, LLC

Defendants

DANIEL PERALTA d/b/a D & K MOBILE HOME

Daniel E Peralta campos

D&K MOBILE HOME LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, THEODORE J

Attorney at Theodore Jon Cohen, Esq.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

AFFIRMATION *Corrected* of Default

AFFIRMATION *Corrected* of Default; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/28/2021

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* includes costs

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* includes costs; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/28/2021

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Non Military Affidavit 9.27.21

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Non Military Affidavit 9.27.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 sent 8.17.21

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 sent 8.17.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/18/2021; Received: 08/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 8.11.21, D&K MOBILE HOME LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 8.11.21, D&K MOBILE HOME LLC; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 8.11.21, DANIEL E PERALTA CAMPOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 8.11.21, DANIEL E PERALTA CAMPOS; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 8.11.21, DANIEL PERALTA DBA D & K MOBILE HOME

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 8.11.21, DANIEL PERALTA DBA D & K MOBILE HOME; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS, D&K MOBILE HOME served 8.11.21

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS, D&K MOBILE HOME served 8.11.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS, D&K MOBILE HOME LLC served 8.11.21

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS, D&K MOBILE HOME LLC served 8.11.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS, Individual served 8.11.21

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS, Individual served 8.11.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Complaint is Verified

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Complaint is Verified; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION *Corrected* of Default; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* includes costs; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Non Military Affidavit 9.27.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 sent 8.17.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/18/2021; Received: 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 8.11.21, D&K MOBILE HOME LLC; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 8.11.21, DANIEL E PERALTA CAMPOS; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 8.11.21, DANIEL PERALTA DBA D & K MOBILE HOME; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS, D&K MOBILE HOME served 8.11.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS, D&K MOBILE HOME LLC served 8.11.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS, Individual served 8.11.21; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Complaint is Verified; Filed By: Cohen, T.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less