This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 20:08:28 (UTC).

PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC v. DEVIN HARTWICK et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DEVIN HARTWICK. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Tait. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1568

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Tait

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC

Defendants

ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION

Devin Hartwick

ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMERMAN, DINA LEAH

Attorney at YANKWITT LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Supplemental Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Supplemental Order; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents

EXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

PETITION (AMENDED)

PETITION (AMENDED); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation

EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents

EXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Supplemental Order; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION (AMENDED); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less