Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/03/2020 at 15:27:43 (UTC).

Pavilion Realty, LLC - v. - Rhonda Darling et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2018 Pavilion Realty, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Rhonda Darling. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********92CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAVILION REALTY LLC

Defendants

City Assessor Corning

CORNING CITY BOARD ASSESSMENT REVIEW

City Corning

Not Yet Classified

Corning Painted Post Area School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLOCUM, GARTH JOHN

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

WILLIAMS, TED HENRY

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

ROBERTS, NICHOLAS CLYDE

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/30/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/30/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service School/County

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service School/County; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 07/21/2018; Received: 07/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service City Clerk

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service City Clerk; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 07/21/2018; Received: 07/21/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Authorization for Attorney to file proceedings

EXHIBIT(S) - C Authorization for Attorney to file proceedings; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Determination of the Board of Assessment Review

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Determination of the Board of Assessment Review; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A RP-524 Complaint on Real Property Assessment

EXHIBIT(S) - A RP-524 Complaint on Real Property Assessment; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1); Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/30/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/30/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service School/County; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 07/21/2018; Received: 07/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service City Clerk; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 07/21/2018; Received: 07/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Authorization for Attorney to file proceedings; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Determination of the Board of Assessment Review; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A RP-524 Complaint on Real Property Assessment; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1); Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Slocum, G.; Filed: 06/30/2018; Received: 06/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less