This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 01:27:34 (UTC).

Paula Lavio - v. - Sciandra Family Limited Partnership et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 Paula Lavio filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sciandra Family Limited Partnership. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando Marrazzo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Orlando Marrazzo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paula Lavio

Defendants and Petitioners

Who's Next Barber Shop

Top Tomato Plaza, LLC

Sciandra Family Limited Partnership

Respondents

Just Jas Inc.

Arjam Ceku D/B/A Ti-Amo Pizzeria

New Hollywood Cleaners Inc.

Travis Wine & Liquors Inc.

Dylan Foods, LLC D/B/A Maynila Oriental Food Market

Living Well Pharmacy, Inc.

Science & Play Entertainment Corp. D/B/A Fun Station USA

Not Yet Classified

Top Tomato Plaza, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FIORE, FARA M.

Attorney at Staten Island Legal Services

KARMAZIN, ALAN GARY

Attorney at ANGIULI & GENTILE, LLP

ROESCH, WALTER JAMES

Attorney at Angiuli & Gentile, LLP

Petitioner Attorneys

STEVEN VERVENIOTIS (17-156)

STEVEN VERVENIOTIS (17-156) FRANK ROBERT MALPIGLI ABRAHAM WARMBRAND

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

VERVENIOTIS, STEVEN

Attorney at MIRANDA SLONE SKLARIN VERVENIOTIS LLP

MALPIGLI, FRANK ROBERT

Attorney at Miranda Slone Sklarin Verveniotis LLP

WARMBRAND, ABRAHAM

Attorney at Miranda Sambursky Slone Sklarin Vervenio

HAZEN, DEANNA ELAINE

Attorney at FLEISCHNER POTASH LLP

BRADY, JOSHUA PAUL

Attorney at Chartwell Law

Lewis, Nancy Davis

Attorney at Fleischner Potash LLP

Respondent Attorneys

MICHAEL H GOTTLIEB

MICHAEL H GOTTLIEB LAUREN MICHELLE SOLARI (38000-06)

MICHAEL B. TITOWSKY

MICHAEL B. TITOWSKY ROBERT SHERWOOD WHITBECK ((AF) 68913)

JOHN PATRICK CONNORS SUSAN E O'SHAUGHNESSY

JOHN PATRICK CONNORS SUSAN E O'SHAUGHNESSY ERIK JAMES MCKENNA (DT26735)

ALEXA JILLIAN RISSOFF

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #008) Affirmation in Reply

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #008) Affirmation in Reply; Filed By: Warmbrand, A.; Filed: 06/23/2020; Received: 06/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #007) Affidavit of Service to Reply Affirmation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #007) Affidavit of Service to Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Rissoff, A.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #006) Reply Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #006) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Mckenna, E.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #007)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #007); Filed By: Rissoff, A.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

AFFIRMATION Reply Affirmation

AFFIRMATION Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Mckenna, E.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #005) Aff in Reply with Aff of Service

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #005) Aff in Reply with Aff of Service; Filed By: Solari, L.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #008) AFFIRMATION IN PARTIAL OPPOSITION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #008) AFFIRMATION IN PARTIAL OPPOSITION; Filed By: Whitbeck, R.; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004) AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004) AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Whitbeck, R.; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #009) AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #009) AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Whitbeck, R.; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation for Default Judgment

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation for Default Judgment; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Verveniotis, S.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fiore, F.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

192 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #008) Affirmation in Reply; Filed By: Warmbrand, A.; Filed: 06/23/2020; Received: 06/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #007) Affidavit of Service to Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Rissoff, A.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #006) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Mckenna, E.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #007); Filed By: Rissoff, A.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Mckenna, E.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #005) Aff in Reply with Aff of Service; Filed By: Solari, L.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #008) AFFIRMATION IN PARTIAL OPPOSITION; Filed By: Whitbeck, R.; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004) AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Whitbeck, R.; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #009) AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Whitbeck, R.; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #008) Page 2 of stipulation; Filed By: Warmbrand, A.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation for Default Judgment; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Verveniotis, S.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fiore, F. - filed by Angiuli & Gentile, LLP; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fiore, F.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less