Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 21:22:12 (UTC).

Paul Sperry - v. - Mansoor H. Beg M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 Paul Sperry filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Mansoor H Beg M D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Sperry

Defendants

Mansoor H. Beg M.D.

North Shore LIJ Medical Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAFA, JOSEPH R.

Attorney at Joseph R. Crafa, PC

Defendant Attorney

FUMUSO, ALAN JAMES

Attorney at FUMUSO, KELLY, SWART, FARRELL, POLIN & CHRISTESEN, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

Note of Issue Certificate of Readiness and Affirmation of Service

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

--none--

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Response to Defendant's Discovery Demands - redacted

EXHIBIT(S)

Bill of Particulars to Defendant North Shore

EXHIBIT(S)

Bill of Particulars to Defendant Beg

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer of Defendant North Shore

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer of Dr. Beg

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint with Cert. of Merit

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

Sperry v. Beg Notice of Med. Mal

ANSWER

NSUH.sha.NSLIJMG

ANSWER

ans.Dr.Beg

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue Certificate of Readiness and Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fumuso, A.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Fumuso, A.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Fumuso, A.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Response to Defendant's Discovery Demands - redacted; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Bill of Particulars to Defendant North Shore; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Bill of Particulars to Defendant Beg; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Answer of Defendant North Shore; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Answer of Dr. Beg; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint with Cert. of Merit; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Sperry v. Beg Notice of Med. Mal; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER NSUH.sha.NSLIJMG; Filed By: Benvenuto, T.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ans.Dr.Beg; Filed By: Benvenuto, T.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Crafa, J.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less