This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 22:51:30 (UTC).

PAUL JAQUEZ - v. - 515 WEST 29TH STREET OWNER LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 PAUL JAQUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 515 WEST 29TH STREET OWNER LLC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Jaquez

Defendants and Petitioners

MCGOWAN BUILDERS INC.

515 WEST 29TH STREET OWNER LLC

Respondent

CUSTOM METALCRAFTERS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

gastman, gregory

Attorney at Gorayeb & Associates, PC

O'MALLEY, MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin P. Westerman

Petitioner Attorney

AOIFE REID DEIRDRE EGAN

Defendant Attorneys

MARTINE, ANTHONY D.

Attorney at MCMAHON MARTINE & GALLAGHER LLP

REID, AOIFE

Attorney at McMahon, Martine & Gallagher

EGAN, DEIRDRE

Attorney at McMahon, Martine & Gallagher, LLP

Respondent Attorney

JASON BRIAN ATKINSON OLIVIA M GROSS (NRRW 22369) ERIK EMANUEL HARRIS

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 3/8/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 3/8/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER DATED: 11/19/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER DATED: 11/19/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER

STIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 02/26/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 02/26/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Atkinson, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Response to Court Order

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Response to Court Order; Filed By: O'Malley, M.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Response to July letter

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Response to July letter; Filed By: O'Malley, M.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: O'Malley, M.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS and Litigation Back

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS and Litigation Back; Filed By: Reid, A.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

AFFIRMATION Affirmation Of Good Faith For PC

AFFIRMATION Affirmation Of Good Faith For PC; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 3/8/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER DATED: 11/19/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 02/26/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Atkinson, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Response to Court Order; Filed By: O'Malley, M.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Response to July letter; Filed By: O'Malley, M.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: O'Malley, M.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS and Litigation Back; Filed By: Reid, A.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Responses to Demands; Filed By: Reid, A.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Lucindo Suarez, J.S.C.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation Of Good Faith For PC; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Martine, A.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less