This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 16:56:26 (UTC).

Paul DiGirolamo v. Stephen Kirtyan

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 Paul DiGirolamo filed an Other lawsuit against Stephen Kirtyan. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Digirolamo

Defendant

Stephen Kirtyan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEVORAH, VICTOR

Attorney at Victor Mevorah PC

Defendant Attorney

TRAFLET, STEPHEN GERARD

Attorney at TRAFLET & FABIAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice of Withdrawal of Summary Judgment Motion

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affirmation of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit K - Radiologist's Report on Lumbar MRI

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit J - Radiologist's Report on Lumbar MRI

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit I - Radiologist's Report on Cervical MRI

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit H - Orthopedist's IME Report

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit G - Cervical MRI

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit F - Lumbar MRI

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION

Good Faith Affirmation

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

Request for PC

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

--none--

ANSWER

Verified Answer and Affirmation of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Service of Stephen Kirtyan

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons and Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Notice of Withdrawal of Summary Judgment Motion; Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Exhibit K - Radiologist's Report on Lumbar MRI Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Exhibit J - Radiologist's Report on Lumbar MRI Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Exhibit I - Radiologist's Report on Cervical MRI Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Exhibit H - Orthopedist's IME Report; Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Exhibit G - Cervical MRI Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Exhibit F - Lumbar MRI Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhibit E - Shoulder MRI Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2018; Received: 03/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected* RJI; Filed By: Mevorah, V.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Mevorah, V.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Good Faith Affirmation; Filed By: Mevorah, V.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected* Request for PC; Filed By: Mevorah, V.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer and Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Traflet, S.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of Stephen Kirtyan; Filed By: Mevorah, V.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Mevorah, V.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less