This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/25/2020 at 14:27:38 (UTC).

PATRICK RODRIGUEZ - v. - MORNINGSIDE HEIGHTS HOUSING CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 PATRICK RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MORNINGSIDE HEIGHTS HOUSING CORPORATION. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Rodriguez

Defendants and Petitioners

MORNINGSIDE HEIGHTS HOUSING CORPORATION

FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL NEW YORK, INC.

Respondent

Team Electric, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREWS-SANTILLO, ASHLEY

LEVINE, MICHAEL SCOTT

Petitioner Attorney

DEVIKA KAPOOR (6225.1391) SEAN OMAR EDWARDS

Defendant Attorneys

EDWARDS, SEAN OMAR

FRENCH, JOSEPH A

KAPOOR, DEVIKA

Respondent Attorney

OLIVIA M GROSS ERIK EMANUEL HARRIS

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Gross, O.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Decision and Order

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Decision and Order; Filed By: Edwards, S.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Order; Filed By: Edwards, S.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - C Contract; Filed By: Kapoor, D.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Verified Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B Verified Answer; Filed By: Kapoor, D.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Kapoor, D.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kapoor, D.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: French, J.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Gross, O.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Decision and Order; Filed By: Edwards, S.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Order; Filed By: Edwards, S.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUR-REPLY (Motion #002); Filed By: Edwards, S.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D COI; Filed By: Kapoor, D.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Contract; Filed By: Kapoor, D.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Verified Answer; Filed By: Kapoor, D.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Kapoor, D.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kapoor, D.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: French, J.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less