This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 03/27/2020 at 13:22:24 (UTC).

Patrick Crocitto - v. - The City Of New York et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 Patrick Crocitto filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The City Of New York. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Crocitto

Defendants

The City Of New York

New York City Department Of Sanitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HERBERT, JASON T

HERBERT, JASON TODD

Defendant Attorneys

Counsel, Corporation

BRODERICK, ANN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER City's Answer

ANSWER City's Answer; Filed By: Broderick, A.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

BILL OF PARTICULARS Bill of Particulars and Response to Combined Demands

BILL OF PARTICULARS Bill of Particulars and Response to Combined Demands; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER City's Answer; Filed By: Broderick, A.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Bill of Particulars and Response to Combined Demands; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less