This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 05:54:54 (UTC).

PATRICIA GANCAREK, as Executrix for the Estate of MORTON FRANKLIN - v. - AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 PATRICIA GANCAREK, as Executrix for the Estate of MORTON FRANKLIN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA GANCAREK, as Executrix for the Estate of MORTON FRANKLIN

Defendants

UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION

GARDNER DENVER, INC.,

LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC.,

FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

H.B. FULLER COMPANY,

GOULD PUMPS LLC,

CARRIER CORPORATION

U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL),

GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES

J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY

THE FAIRBANKS COMPANY

AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.,

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION,

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris, Inc.

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DECICCO, LINDSAY MARIE

KANCA, JEFFREY SCOTT

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

BALSAMO, STEPHEN FRANCIS

Attorney at GARRITY, GRAHAM, MURPHY, GAROFALO & FLINN

SMITHENS, DIANA PATRICIA

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

CALCAGNO, TERANCE ROWE

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

SQUITIERI, VIRGINIA PAULA

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

LEE, LAWRENCE G.

Attorney at LYNCH DASKAL EMERY LLP

Regev, Elissa

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery LLP

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

CARNI, URIEL SHMAYA

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd.

WAYNE, EVA S

Attorney at MALABY & BRADLEY

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLEIN, GARY R

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG PC

Other Attorneys

HAAG, SARAH RUTH

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

MENDELSOHN, RICHARD LEE

Attorney at Malaby & Bradley, LLC

GASIOR, JOAN M.

Attorney at Renzulli Law Firm LLP

CURTIS, MICHAEL JAMES

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Fuller, B.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Fuller, B.; Filed: 09/18/2018; Received: 09/18/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B The Fairbanks Company -Exhbit B -Service Rider

EXHIBIT(S) - B The Fairbanks Company -Exhbit B -Service Rider; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A The Fairbanks Company Exhibit A Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filling For Bankrupcy

EXHIBIT(S) - A The Fairbanks Company Exhibit A Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filling For Bankrupcy; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI) The Fairbanks Company

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI) The Fairbanks Company; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wayne, E. - filed by Malaby & Bradley, LLC; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Wayne, E. - filed by Malaby & Bradley, LLC; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Preliminary Injunction Order

EXHIBIT(S) - B Preliminary Injunction Order; Filed By: Lee, L.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Chapter 11 Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - A Chapter 11 Petition; Filed By: Lee, L.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Pfizer's Acknowledgment of Service

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Pfizer's Acknowledgment of Service; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Georgia-Pacific LLC's Acknowledgment of Receipt

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Georgia-Pacific LLC's Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed By: Regev, E.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Dean, A.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Squitieri, V.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

ANSWER AOR - Aurora Pump Company

ANSWER AOR - Aurora Pump Company; Filed By: Haag, S.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Union Carbide Corporation's Acknowledgment of Service

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Union Carbide Corporation's Acknowledgment of Service; Filed By: Yavitz, J.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Asbestos Litigation

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Asbestos Litigation; Filed By: Balsamo, S.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Lennox Industries Answer with Cross Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Lennox Industries Answer with Cross Claims; Filed By: Smithens, D.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Decicco, L.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Fuller, B.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Fuller, B.; Filed: 09/18/2018; Received: 09/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B The Fairbanks Company -Exhbit B -Service Rider; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A The Fairbanks Company Exhibit A Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filling For Bankrupcy; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI) The Fairbanks Company; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wayne, E. - filed by Malaby & Bradley, LLC; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Wayne, E. - filed by Malaby & Bradley, LLC; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Preliminary Injunction Order; Filed By: Lee, L.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Chapter 11 Petition; Filed By: Lee, L.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI) Bestwall LLC f/k/a Georgia-Pacific LLC f/k/a Georgia-Pacific LLC, a North Carolina limited liability company's Notice of Bankruptcy; Filed By: Lee, L.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE CertainTeed Corporation; Filed By: Yavitz, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Pfizer's Acknowledgment of Service; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Georgia-Pacific LLC's Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed By: Regev, E.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Dean, A.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Squitieri, V.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AOR - Aurora Pump Company; Filed By: Haag, S.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Union Carbide Corporation's Acknowledgment of Service; Filed By: Yavitz, J.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Asbestos Litigation; Filed By: Balsamo, S.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Lennox Industries Answer with Cross Claims; Filed By: Smithens, D.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Decicco, L.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less