Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 17:11:09 (UTC).

Patricia Flood v. The Wallkill Living Center et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Patricia Flood filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Wallkill Living Center. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A Onofry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A Onofry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Flood

Defendants and Petitioners

Town of Wallkill

The Wallkill Living Center Limited Partnership

The Wallkill Living Center, LLC

The Wallkill Living Center

Town of Wallkill Industrial Development Agency

Respondent

BELLA LAWNS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

Petitioner Attorney

HEATHER J. JULIEN

Defendant Attorneys

SCHUH, MARK LAWRENCE

Attorney at Law Office of Mark L Schuh, PLLC

JULIEN, HEATHER J.

Attorney at Fullerton Beck LLP

BECK, KATRINE A

Attorney at Fullerton Beck, LLP

Respondent Attorney

DEBRA CHIESA SALVI (388-19835)

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2021; Received: 01/28/2021

ANSWER Verified Answer to Third-Party Defendant's Counter-Claim

ANSWER Verified Answer to Third-Party Defendant's Counter-Claim; Filed By: Julien, H.; Filed: 01/22/2021; Received: 01/22/2021

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands to All Parties

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands to All Parties; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Litigation Funding

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Litigation Funding; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Medicare/Medicaid Info

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Medicare/Medicaid Info; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

DEMAND FOR: Demand for a Verified Third-Party Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR: Demand for a Verified Third-Party Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 12/23/2020; Received: 12/23/2020

ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Counterclaims

ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Counterclaims; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 12/23/2020; Received: 12/23/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Julien, H.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schuh, M.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Schuh, M.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2021; Received: 01/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Third-Party Defendant's Counter-Claim; Filed By: Julien, H.; Filed: 01/22/2021; Received: 01/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands to All Parties; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Litigation Funding; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Medicare/Medicaid Info; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for a Verified Third-Party Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 12/23/2020; Received: 12/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Counterclaims; Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 12/23/2020; Received: 12/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Julien, H.; Filed: 12/04/2020; Received: 12/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition; Filed By: Julien, H.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Julien, H.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schuh, M.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Schuh, M.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less