This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 09:11:10 (UTC).

Paston Group, LLC v. World Properties, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Paston Group, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against World Properties, LLC. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen Bucaria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Stephen Bucaria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paston Group, LLC

Defendants

Lynbrook Sunrise Realty, LLC

World Properties, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHIMEK, MICHAEL D

Attorney at Levitt LLP

Gomberg, Trevor Michael

Attorney at Levitt LLP

Defendant Attorney

HIRSCHEL, DANIEL E

Attorney at Hirschel Law Firm, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Amended Answer with Counterclaims

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Amended Answer with Counterclaims; Filed By: Hirschel, D.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

ORDER - OTHER SPECIAL MASTER

ORDER - OTHER SPECIAL MASTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE regarding 10/24/19 hearing

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE regarding 10/24/19 hearing; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION

ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Motion #003) Hearing Subpoena Alexandros Demetriades

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Motion #003) Hearing Subpoena Alexandros Demetriades; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Andrea Robinson with annexed pictures

EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Andrea Robinson with annexed pictures; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Medical Records (redacted) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Medical Records (redacted) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Christopher Smith with annexed Mold Report

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Christopher Smith with annexed Mold Report; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B pictures of mold

EXHIBIT(S) - B pictures of mold; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A picture of dead mice

EXHIBIT(S) - A picture of dead mice; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Emergency Attorney Affirmation in Support of Order to Show Cause

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Emergency Attorney Affirmation in Support of Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) proposed Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) proposed Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint with annexed Exhibits A & B

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint with annexed Exhibits A & B; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Amended Answer with Counterclaims; Filed By: Hirschel, D.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER SPECIAL MASTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE regarding 10/24/19 hearing; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Motion #003) Hearing Subpoena Alexandros Demetriades; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Letter and Space Pictures; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Case Law (highlighted); Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Andrea Robinson with annexed pictures; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Medical Records (redacted) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Christopher Smith with annexed Mold Report; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B pictures of mold; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A picture of dead mice; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Emergency Attorney Affirmation in Support of Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) proposed Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Verified Complaint with annexed Exhibits A & B; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Schimek, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less