Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 15:37:33 (UTC).

PAMELA SLOVES as Executrix of the Estate of et al v. GARY SHORE M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 PAMELA SLOVES as Executrix of the Estate of filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against GARY SHORE M D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Antonio I Brandveen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Antonio I Brandveen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Geraldine S. Weissman DECEASED

Pamela Sloves AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF

Defendants

Diana O'neill N.P.

Gary Shore M.D.

GARY SHORE, M.D., P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BURKE, MARIANNE C.

Attorney at SILBERSTEIN AWAD & MIKLOS

OLIVA, LINDA MARIE

Attorney at SILBERSTEIN AWAD & MIKLOS, PC

Defendant Attorneys

GIOVACCO, KATHERINE A

Attorney at CATALANO GALLARDO & PETROPOULOS, LLP

GERMANAKOS, PETER LOUIS

Attorney at Catalano Gallardo & Petropoulos LLP

KUTNER, CHARLES E

Attorney at KUTNER FRIEDRICH, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Giovacco, K.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Execution Page- Pamela Sloves

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Execution Page- Pamela Sloves; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand

DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand

DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court Re Adjournment

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court Re Adjournment; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Proposed Amended Answer w/crossclaims

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Proposed Amended Answer w/crossclaims; Filed By: Germanakos, P.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Proposed Stipulation

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Proposed Stipulation; Filed By: Germanakos, P.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for BP as to Gary Shore, M.D., P.C.

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for BP as to Gary Shore, M.D., P.C.; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for BP as to Gary Shore, M.D.

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for BP as to Gary Shore, M.D.; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

ANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burke, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burke, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Burke, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burke, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons and Amended Verified Complaint

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons and Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Burke, M.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT W/EFILING NOTICE

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT W/EFILING NOTICE; Filed By: Burke, M.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Giovacco, K.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Execution Page- Pamela Sloves; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court Re Adjournment; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Proposed Amended Answer w/crossclaims; Filed By: Germanakos, P.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Proposed Stipulation; Filed By: Germanakos, P.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Bills of Particulars; Filed By: Germanakos, P.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for BP as to Gary Shore, M.D., P.C.; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for BP as to Gary Shore, M.D.; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burke, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burke, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Burke, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burke, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons and Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Burke, M.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT W/EFILING NOTICE; Filed By: Burke, M.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less