This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:05:52 (UTC).

OSLBALDO NUNEZ - v. - JOHN DOE et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 OSLBALDO NUNEZ filed an Other lawsuit against JOHN DOE. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oslbaldo Nunez

Defendants

John Doe DEFENDANT'S REAL NAME BEING UNKNOWN

Haney M. Saker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRATT, KEVIN DANA

Attorney at GRATT& ASSOCIATES P.C.

Defendant Attorney

MORRISSEY, COLIN FRANCIS

Attorney at Colin F. Morrissey Esq/

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gratt, K.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

ANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTCULARS

ANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTCULARS; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service; Filed By: Gratt, K.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gratt, K.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gratt, K.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTCULARS; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service; Filed By: Gratt, K.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gratt, K.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less