This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 06/27/2020 at 02:54:27 (UTC).

OPPATHAI RAVANAN - v. - THANH TONG TRAN et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 OPPATHAI RAVANAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THANH TONG TRAN. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando Marrazzo. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Orlando Marrazzo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oppathai Ravanan

Defendants

Ana Marie Rivera sanchez INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS ESTETICA UNISEX RIVERA

Thanh Tong Tran

Ly Hong Tran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAFARO, KATHRYN M.

ROSENBLATT, HELEN M.

Defendant Attorney

GOLD, JEFFREY B

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Gold, J.; Filed: 05/21/2020; Received: 05/21/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cafaro, K.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Cafaro, K.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004); Filed By: Gold, J.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Defendant Deposition Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Defendant Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Gold, J.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Lease

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Lease; Filed By: Gold, J.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) NYC DEPARTMENT OF BUILDINGS SEARCH

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) NYC DEPARTMENT OF BUILDINGS SEARCH; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) GOOGLE MAP

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) GOOGLE MAP; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR THANH TONG TRAN

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR THANH TONG TRAN; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR LY HONG TRAN

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR LY HONG TRAN; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Gold, J.; Filed: 05/21/2020; Received: 05/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cafaro, K.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Cafaro, K.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004); Filed By: Gold, J.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Defendant Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Gold, J.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Lease; Filed By: Gold, J.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service for Answer; Filed By: Gold, J.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ANA MARIE RIVERA SANCHEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS ESTETICA UNISEX RIVERA; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) NYC DEPARTMENT OF BUILDINGS SEARCH; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) GOOGLE MAP; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR THANH TONG TRAN; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR LY HONG TRAN; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less