This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/27/2020 at 15:04:55 (UTC).

ONOFRIO MAZZURCO et al - v. - BROADWAY 52ND L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 ONOFRIO MAZZURCO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BROADWAY 52ND L P. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Onofrio Mazzurco

Giuseppina Mazzurco

Defendants

ROBERT B SAMUELS, INC.

BROADWAY 52ND L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FANNING, DOUGLAS J.

Cassell, Michael David

Defendant Attorneys

RUSSO, ALAN S

HALL, THOMAS JAMES

COHN, SETH HARRIS

 

Court Documents

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Notice to ALL PARTIES re: temporary procedures for Fabiani Cohen & Hall, LLP

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Notice to ALL PARTIES re: temporary procedures for Fabiani Cohen & Hall, LLP; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 03/25/2020; Received: 03/25/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order w/ NOE

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order w/ NOE; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Hall, T.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Russo, A.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to extend time to Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to extend time to Answer; Filed By: Weiser, D.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - all defendants

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - all defendants; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Notice to ALL PARTIES re: temporary procedures for Fabiani Cohen & Hall, LLP; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 03/25/2020; Received: 03/25/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order w/ NOE; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Change of Suite and Phone/Fax; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 12/04/2018; Received: 12/04/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Hall, T.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Russo, A.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to extend time to Answer; Filed By: Weiser, D.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - all defendants; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less