This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 22:39:42 (UTC).

Onofre Antonio Morales - v. - BUTT ASSOCIATES INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 Onofre Antonio Morales filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BUTT ASSOCIATES INC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onofre Antonio Morales

Defendants and Petitioners

TRI-STATE CONTRACTING GROUP CORP.

BUTT ASSOCIATES INC.

Respondent

C.M.C. Home Improvement Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

gastman, gregory

Attorney at Gorayeb & Associates, PC

ROSS, MATTHEW J

Attorney at PENA & KAHN, PLLC

Petitioner Attorney

CURTIS SOBEL (JR-13830) PAUL XAVIER LIMA

Defendant Attorneys

LIMA, PAUL XAVIER

Attorney at Sobel Pevzner LLC

SOBEL, CURTIS

Attorney at SOBEL LAW GROUP, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - OTHER DATED 1/28/2020

STIPULATION - OTHER DATED 1/28/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

STIPULATION - OTHER

STIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER

STIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 2/26/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 2/26/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 1/22/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 1/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DATED 9/21/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DATED 9/21/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) March 27, 2018 letter

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) March 27, 2018 letter; Filed By: Lima, P.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) affidavit of service on CMC of third party complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) affidavit of service on CMC of third party complaint; Filed By: Lima, P.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) affidavit of service and rule 3402 statement

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) affidavit of service and rule 3402 statement; Filed By: Lima, P.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Sobel, C.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sobel, C.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims & Initial Discovery Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims & Initial Discovery Demands; Filed By: Sobel, C.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER DATED 1/28/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 2/26/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 1/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DATED 9/21/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) March 27, 2018 letter; Filed By: Lima, P.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) affidavit of service on CMC of third party complaint; Filed By: Lima, P.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) affidavit of service and rule 3402 statement; Filed By: Lima, P.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) verified answer; Filed By: Lima, P.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Def/3rd Party Pltf - Verified Answer; Filed By: Sobel, C.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Sobel, C.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sobel, C.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims & Initial Discovery Demands; Filed By: Sobel, C.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less