This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/21/2023 at 15:14:42 (UTC).

Officer Michael J Lee v. Donald J Alianello

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Officer Michael J Lee filed an Other lawsuit against Donald J Alianello. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank A Sedita. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2022

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank A Sedita

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Officer michael J Lee

Defendant

Donald J Alianello

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRUNDY, JOEL MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Handed to Donald Alianello after the November 29, 2022 Court Appearance

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Handed to Donald Alianello after the November 29, 2022 Court Appearance; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

EXTRACT

EXTRACT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/07/2022; Received: 12/07/2022

 

Docket Entries

12/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (FINAL-DENIED); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/07/2022; Received: 12/07/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (RETURN WEAPONS-RESPONDENT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/07/2022; Received: 12/07/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXTRACT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/07/2022; Received: 12/07/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Handed to Donald Alianello after the November 29, 2022 Court Appearance; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - OTHER Order for Background Investigation; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/23/2022; Received: 11/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (HEARING-AMEND/VACATE); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/22/2022; Received: 11/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (TEMPORARY-GRANTED); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/22/2022; Received: 11/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER APPLICATION; Filed By: Grundy, J.; Filed: 11/22/2022; Received: 11/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPLICATION - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (TEMPORARY); Filed By: Grundy, J.; Filed: 11/22/2022; Received: 11/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less