This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 06:37:34 (UTC).

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC v. MARGARITA SANTIAGO et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARGARITA SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #10, said names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, intended to be possible tenants or occupants of the premises, or corporations, persons, or other entities having or claiming a lien upon the mortgaged premises

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Margarita Santiago

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SILVER, JASON DAVID

Attorney at GREENSPOON MARDER, LLP

HAMILTON, HOLLY MAE

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-LOUIS MARTINEZ AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-LOUIS MARTINEZ AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LOUIS MARTINEZ AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LOUIS MARTINEZ AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARGARITA SANTIAGO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARGARITA SANTIAGO; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING LOUIS MARTINEZ AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING LOUIS MARTINEZ AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer to Foreclosure Complaint & Verification & Affidavit of Service

ANSWER Verified Answer to Foreclosure Complaint & Verification & Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN(..); Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215 - MARGARITA SANTIAGO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215 - MARGARITA SANTIAGO; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-LOUIS MARTINEZ AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LOUIS MARTINEZ AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARGARITA SANTIAGO; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING LOUIS MARTINEZ AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Foreclosure Complaint & Verification & Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215 - MARGARITA SANTIAGO; Filed By: Silver, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Hamilton, H.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less