This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:35:39 (UTC).

NYCTL 2018-A TRUST et al v. JEAN FRANTZ BEAULIEU et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 NYCTL 2018-A TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JEAN FRANTZ BEAULIEU. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON as Collateral Agent and Custodian for the NYCTL 2018-A Trust

NYCTL 2018-A TRUST

Defendants

ALBANY AVENUE PARTNERS, LLC

PEOPLE'S UNITED BANK

Jean Frantz beaulieu

individual defendants be dead, their heirs at law, next of kin, distributees, executors, administrators, trustees, committees, devisees, legatees, and the assignees, lienors, creditors and successors in interest of them, and generally all persons hav

John Doe No. 1 through John Doe No. 100 inclusive, the names of the last 100 defendants being fictitious, the true names of said defendants being unknown to plaintiff, it being intended to designate fee owners, tenants or occupants of the liened prem

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL HUNTER

Attorney at BRONSTER LLP

ABT, JOSEF F.

Attorney at Bronster LLP

KRECHMER, LEONID D.

Attorney at BRONSTER, LLP

Defendant Attorney

PEPITONE, SUSAN ROSE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SUSAN PEPITONE

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - F E-Filing Requirements

EXHIBIT(S) - F E-Filing Requirements; Filed By: Pepitone, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Pepitone, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Notice Distribution Report Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Notice Distribution Report Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Notices

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Notices; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Relevant Portions of the Notices

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Relevant Portions of the Notices; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Pamela Parker-Cortijo

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Pamela Parker-Cortijo; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Tax Lien

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Tax Lien; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Notice Of Entry

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Notice Of Entry; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Affidavit Of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEN FRANTZ BEAULIEW

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEN FRANTZ BEAULIEW; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEAN FRANTZ BEAULIEW

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEAN FRANTZ BEAULIEW; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALBANY AVE PARTNERS LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALBANY AVE PARTNERS LLC; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE SMITH DOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE SMITH DOE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F E-Filing Requirements; Filed By: Pepitone, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Pepitone, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Notice Distribution Report Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Notices; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Relevant Portions of the Notices; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Pamela Parker-Cortijo; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Tax Lien; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Notice Of Entry; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Memorandum of Law; Filed By: Abt, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE'S UNITED BANK; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEN FRANTZ BEAULIEW; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEAN FRANTZ BEAULIEW; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALBANY AVE PARTNERS LLC; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE SMITH DOE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less