This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 12:31:49 (UTC).

NYCTL 2018-A TRUST AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, AS COLLATERAL AGENT AND CUSTODIAN v. MITUOB INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 NYCTL 2018-A TRUST AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, AS COLLATERAL AGENT AND CUSTODIAN filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MITUOB INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NYCTL 2018-A TRUST AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, AS COLLATERAL AGENT AND CUSTODIAN

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

MITUOB INC.

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IACCHETTA, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

EVANS, RICHARD J

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

Defendant Attorney

MIRRO, MICHELE

Attorney at NYC Department of Finance

 

Court Documents

ORDER - REFERENCE & amend caption, dtd 6/17/19

ORDER - REFERENCE & amend caption, dtd 6/17/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Forbearance Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Forbearance Agreement; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Merit

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Merit; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Appearence

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Appearence; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Forbearance Agreement; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE & amend caption, dtd 6/17/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Merit; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Appearence; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Affirmed Statement of Reularity; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Mirro, M.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less