This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/26/2020 at 21:31:06 (UTC).

NYCTL 2017-A TRUST, - v. - 561 WYONA INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2018 NYCTL 2017-A TRUST filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against 561 WYONA INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NYCTL 2017-A TRUST, AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, AS COLLATERAL AGENT AND CUSTODIAN FOR THE NYCTL 2017-A TRUST

Defendants

CITY OF NEW YORK WATER ENFORCEMENT UNIT

Allan S. Jones A/K/A ALAN JONES

561 WYONA INC.

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE

Winston Lawrence

John Doe NO. 1 THROUGH JOHN DOE NO. 100 INCLUSIVE

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

THE NAMES OF THE LAST 100 DEFENDANTS BEING FICTITIOUS, THE TRUE NAMES OF SAID, DEFENDANTS BEING UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFFS, IT BEING INTENDED TO DESIGNATE FEE OWNERS, TENANTS OR OCCUPANTS OF THE LIENED PREMISES AND/OR PERSONS OR PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

J.E.M. PROPERTIES LLC

Izia Rokosz

STATE OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

IF THE AFORESAID INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS BE DEAD, THEIR HEIRS AT LAW, NEXT OF KIN, DISTRIBUTEES, EXECUTORS, ADMINISTRATORS, TRUSTEES, COMMITTEES, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, AND THE ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS AND SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF THEM, AND GENERALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPOSATO, MELISSA A.

Attorney at MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY, LLC

KRAPF, JAMIE C

Attorney at McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC

FIERST, TIMOTHY J.

Attorney at The Fierst Law Group P.C.

Defendant Attorney

GARY, CHARLES EDWARD

Attorney at NYS Office of the Attorney General

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Cancelling Notice of Pendency

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Cancelling Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN SMITH

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN SMITH; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE SMITH

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE SMITH; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NATASHA SMITH

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NATASHA SMITH; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gary, C.; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Cancelling Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN SMITH; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE SMITH; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NATASHA SMITH; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARJENIS SMITH; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Fierst, T. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gary, C.; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Krapf, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less