This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 18:32:26 (UTC).

NYCTL 2016-A TRUST et al - v. - 4-WAY GROUP, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2017 NYCTL 2016-A TRUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 4-WAY GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NYCTL 2016-A TRUST

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON as Collateral Agent and Custodian for the NYCTL 2016-A Trust

Defendants

John Doe No. 1 through John Doe No. 100 inclusive, the names of the last 100 defendants being fictitious, the true names of said defendants being unknown to plaintiff, it being intended to designate fee owners, tenants or occupants of the liened prem

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE

4-WAY GROUP, LLC

HONG KONG CAPITAL GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL HUNTER

Attorney at BRONSTER LLP

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL H

Attorney at WINDELS MARX LANE & MITTENDORF LLP

BORODANSKI, YAN

Attorney at Bronster LLP

Defendant Attorneys

FILE, HOWARD M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HOWARD M. FILE, P.C.

FRANZELLA, GIUSEPPE

Attorney at LAZER, APTHEKER, ROSELLA & YEDID, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Canceling Notice of Pendency

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Canceling Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Borodanski, Y.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Borodanski, Y.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 01/23/2018; Received: 01/23/2018

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/29/2017; Received: 10/29/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/29/2017; Received: 10/29/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit to Affidavit of Megan Meyer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit to Affidavit of Megan Meyer; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/29/2017; Received: 10/29/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit to Affidavit of Megan Meyer

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit to Affidavit of Megan Meyer; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/29/2017; Received: 10/29/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance by Giuseppe Franzella

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance by Giuseppe Franzella; Filed By: Franzella, G.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - b Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - b Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - a Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - a Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Canceling Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Borodanski, Y.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Borodanski, Y.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 01/23/2018; Received: 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/29/2017; Received: 10/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/29/2017; Received: 10/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit to Affidavit of Megan Meyer; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/29/2017; Received: 10/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit to Affidavit of Megan Meyer; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/29/2017; Received: 10/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Megan Meyer; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/29/2017; Received: 10/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance by Giuseppe Franzella; Filed By: Franzella, G.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less