This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 02:42:49 (UTC).

NYCTL 1998-2 Trust et al - v. - FAITH EVANGELISTIC ASSEMBLY OF GOD, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 NYCTL 1998-2 Trust filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FAITH EVANGELISTIC ASSEMBLY OF GOD, INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Bank of New York Mellon as Collateral Agent and Custodian for the NYCTL 1998-2 Trust

NYCTL 1998-2 Trust

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE

FAITH EVANGELISTIC ASSEMBLY OF GOD, INC.

Joshua Thomas S/H/A JOHN DOE NO 1

DAVID GRAYSON LIFE CHANGING MINISTRIES, INC.

Leroy Thomas S/H/A JOHN DOE NO 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL HUNTER

Attorney at BRONSTER LLP

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL H

Attorney at WINDELS MARX LANE & MITTENDORF LLP

KRECHMER, LEONID D.

Attorney at BRONSTER, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry with Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry with Order; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Proposed Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Proposed Order; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #3) Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #3) Judgment; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #3) Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #3) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Rosen Affirmation in Support of Motion to Discontinue Action and Vacate Judgment of Foreclosure and ... show more

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Rosen Affirmation in Support of Motion to Discontinue Action and Vacate Judgment of Foreclosure and ... show more; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Appoint Referee

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Appoint Referee; Filed By: Krechmer, L.; Filed: 07/16/2017; Received: 07/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - b Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - b Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - a Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - a Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry with Order; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Proposed Order; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #3) Judgment; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #3) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Rosen Affirmation in Support of Motion to Discontinue Action and Vacate Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Leonid Krechmer; Filed By: Krechmer, L.; Filed: 07/16/2017; Received: 07/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Appoint Referee; Filed By: Krechmer, L.; Filed: 07/16/2017; Received: 07/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less