This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:43:39 (UTC).

NYCTL 1998-2 TRUST AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, AS COLLATERAL AGENT AND CUSTODIAN et al - v. - 6 REVERE, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 NYCTL 1998-2 TRUST AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, AS COLLATERAL AGENT AND CUSTODIAN filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 6 REVERE, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NYCTL 2015-A TRUST AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, AS COLLATERAL AGENT AND CUSTODIAN

NYCTL 1998-2 TRUST AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, AS COLLATERAL AGENT AND CUSTODIAN

Defendants

JOHN DOE 1 THROUGH JOHN DOE 100, the names of the last 100 defendants being fictitious, the true names of said defendants being unknown to plaintiffs, it being intended to designate fee owners, tenants or occupants of the liened premises and/or

DISCOVER BANK

persons or, parties having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the liened premises, if the aforesaid individual defendants are living, and if any or all of said individual defendants are dead, their heirs at law, next of kin, distributees, execut

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

SAMUEL KAHAN

STATE STREET BANK AND TRUST COMPANY, AS CUSTODIAN/TRUSTEE

administrators, trustees, committees, devisees, legatees, and the assignees, lienors, creditors and successors in interest of the them, and generally all persons having or claiming under, by, through, or against the said defendants named as a class,

CHASE BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

HANN FINANCIAL SERVICE CORP.

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

NORSTAR MORTGAGE CORPORATION, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO INTERCOUNTY MORTGAGE CORP.

any, right, title or interest in or lien upon the premises described in the complaint herein

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

1410 EQUITIES LLC

6 REVERE, LLC

WILLIAM ELBOGEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IACCHETTA, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

EVANS, RICHARD J

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Discontinuance

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Discontinuance; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

SUMMONS SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Discontinuance; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less