This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 05/07/2020 at 00:55:49 (UTC).

Northern Federal Credit Union - v. - Marianne M. Rockhill

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 Northern Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Marianne M Rockhill. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James P Mcclusky. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1824

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James P Mcclusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northern Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Marianne M Mikula

Marianne M Rockhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEURTSEN, DAVID BAERTUS

Attorney at CONBOY MCKAY BACHMAN & KENDALL, LLP.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/28/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1)

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit "A"

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit "A"; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit "A"; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less