This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 05/07/2020 at 00:55:39 (UTC).

Northern Federal Credit Union - v. - Brandon J. Zehr

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 Northern Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Brandon J Zehr. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James P Mcclusky. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1827

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James P Mcclusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northern Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Brandon J Zehr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEURTSEN, DAVID BAERTUS

Attorney at CONBOY MCKAY BACHMAN & KENDALL, LLP.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/19/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1)

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) Request for Attorney Fees

RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) Request for Attorney Fees; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected*

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit "A"

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit "A"; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) Request for Attorney Fees; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit "A"; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Geurtsen, D.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less