This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 18:40:01 (UTC).

NORTH EAST WELCH FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. ALLISON SYPER AKA COLE

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 NORTH EAST WELCH FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLISON SYPER AKA COLE. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0802

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH EAST WELCH FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

Allison Cole

Allison Syper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

Attorney at CHIARI & ILECKI, LLP

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1)

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) military status

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less