This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:10:49 (UTC).

Norman Long - v. - Southern Tier Printers Supply, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Norman Long filed an Other lawsuit against Southern Tier Printers Supply, Inc. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norman Long

Defendants

John Doe

Southern Tier Printers Supply, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RENNA, ROBERT J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. RENNA, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

Pitcoff, Kenneth E

Attorney at Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley

MERRILL, ANTHONY VINCENT

Attorney at Morris, Duffy, Alonso, Faley, LLP.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) pleadings; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) CC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) CC Order; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Pitcoff, K.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) 9/6/18 Order

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) 9/6/18 Order; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Second Motion to Vacate NOI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Second Motion to Vacate NOI; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #3); Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Post EBT Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Post EBT Demands; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/02/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/02/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Affirmation of Noah Reiss

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Affirmation of Noah Reiss; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Second Motion to Vacate NOI; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Affirmation of Noah Reiss; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) 9/6/18 Order; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) CC Order; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Post EBT Demands; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) pleadings; Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #3); Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Merrill, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 9/6/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2018; Received: 09/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/02/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Pitcoff, K.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less