This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 07/27/2023 at 16:46:27 (UTC).

Noelle DelZoppo v. Nicholas D'Angelo

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Noelle DelZoppo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Nicholas D'Angelo. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Montour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mark A Montour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noelle Delzoppo

Defendant

Nicholas D'angelo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCULLE, CATHERINE JANE

KORN, LINDYSUE

Defendant Attorneys

MELBER, BRIAN M

HAPEMAN, SCOTT R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/21/2020; Received: 08/21/2020

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/21/2020; Received: 08/21/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER trial

RJI -RE: OTHER trial; Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/21/2020; Received: 08/21/2020

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/31/2020; Received: 08/31/2020

SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)

SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI); Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/31/2020; Received: 08/31/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 09/08/2020; Received: 09/08/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Melber, B.; Filed: 03/10/2021; Received: 03/10/2021

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 04/02/2021; Received: 04/02/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Melber, B.; Filed: 10/22/2021; Received: 10/22/2021

ORDER - RECUSAL

ORDER - RECUSAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/02/2022; Received: 02/02/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Hapeman, S.; Filed: 04/28/2022; Received: 04/28/2022

ANSWER *Corrected* Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint

ANSWER *Corrected* Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; Filed By: Hapeman, S.; Filed: 04/28/2022; Received: 04/28/2022

 

Docket Entries

04/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER *Corrected* Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; Filed By: Hapeman, S.; Filed: 04/28/2022; Received: 04/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Hapeman, S.; Filed: 04/28/2022; Received: 04/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - RECUSAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/02/2022; Received: 02/02/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Melber, B.; Filed: 10/22/2021; Received: 10/22/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 04/02/2021; Received: 04/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Melber, B.; Filed: 03/10/2021; Received: 03/10/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 09/08/2020; Received: 09/08/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI); Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/31/2020; Received: 08/31/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/31/2020; Received: 08/31/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: OTHER trial; Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/21/2020; Received: 08/21/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/21/2020; Received: 08/21/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Korn, L.; Filed: 08/21/2020; Received: 08/21/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less