This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:35:32 (UTC).

NINEL SHAMSULDINOVA - v. - 3223 QUENTIN ROAD, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 NINEL SHAMSULDINOVA filed an Other lawsuit against 3223 QUENTIN ROAD, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ninel Shamsuldinova

Defendants

3223 QUENTIN ROAD, LLC

THE FAMILY T, LLC

TEA AT THE CENTER, INC., d/b/a T FUSION STEAKHOUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIKHMAN, KARL

Attorney at BIKHMAN & VINBAYTEL, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

LANEZ-SHARMA, CHARLENE THERESA

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP

TYRIE, JAMES PATRICK

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP

NAQVI, HYDER ABBAS

Attorney at Law Office of Lovas & Naqvi

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bikhman, K. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Good faith letter with proofs of mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Good faith letter with proofs of mailing; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bikhman, K. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lanez-Sharma, C.; Filed: 08/28/2018; Received: 08/28/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bikhman, K. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Lanez-Sharma, C.; Filed: 07/12/2018; Received: 07/12/2018

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Tyrie, J.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination; Filed By: Tyrie, J.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer With Cross-Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer With Cross-Claims; Filed By: Tyrie, J.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Answer to Defendant, 3223 Quentin Road, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Answer to Defendant, 3223 Quentin Road, LLC; Filed By: Naqvi, H.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Lanez-Sharma, C.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH; Filed By: Bikhman, K. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Tyrie, J.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Naqvi, H.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Suporting Affidavit and Affirmation

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Suporting Affidavit and Affirmation; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Naqvi, H.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lanez-Sharma, C.; Filed: 08/28/2018; Received: 08/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Tyrie, J.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination; Filed By: Tyrie, J.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Tyrie, J.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer With Cross-Claims; Filed By: Tyrie, J.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Lanez-Sharma, C.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Lanez-Sharma, C.; Filed: 07/12/2018; Received: 07/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Answer to Defendant, 3223 Quentin Road, LLC; Filed By: Naqvi, H.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Naqvi, H.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service of the notice of motion; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Good faith letter with proofs of mailing; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Suporting Affidavit and Affirmation; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH; Filed By: Bikhman, K. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bikhman, K. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bikhman, K. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bikhman, K. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bikhman, K.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less