This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:58:40 (UTC).

NILES SUMMERS - v. - 421 KENT DEVELOPMENT, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 NILES SUMMERS filed an Other lawsuit against 421 KENT DEVELOPMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Niles Summers

Defendants and Petitioners

421 KENT DEVELOPMENT, LLC

WONDER WORKS CONSTRUCTION CORP

EVEREST SCAFFOLDING, INC.

Defendant and Respondent

EVEREST SCAFFOLDING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILBAUER, SETH

Attorney at GREENSTEIN & MILBAUER, LLP

Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL L LEEST DOUGLAS JORDAN DOMSKY

Defendant Attorneys

LEEST, MICHAEL L

Attorney at Hannum Feretic Prendergast & Merlino LLC

DOMSKY, DOUGLAS JORDAN

Attorney at Hannum, Feretic, Prendergast & Merlino, LLC

AVOLIO, JONATHAN ROBERT

Attorney at Wade Clark Mulcahy LLP

Respondent Attorney

HILLARY ELAINE GOMEZ CHERYL DIANA FUCHS (250.10615.3) JONATHAN ROBERT AVOLIO

 

Court Documents

ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION dtd 1/10/18

ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION dtd 1/10/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Milbauer, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION; Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

ANSWER Answer To Verified Complaint

ANSWER Answer To Verified Complaint; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 01/16/2018; Received: 01/16/2018

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Milbauer, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

DEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery and Inspection

DEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Milbauer, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Milbauer, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint with Cross-Claims

ANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Massidas, A.; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Massidas, A.; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDING CAPTION dtd 1/10/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION; Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 01/16/2018; Received: 01/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to Mandatory Insurer Reporting Law 111 of Public Law 110-73; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer To Verified Complaint; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Milbauer, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Milbauer, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Milbauer, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Milbauer, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Milbauer, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less