This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 19:22:31 (UTC).

Nicole Giaquinto - v. - Patrina Scotto et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 Nicole Giaquinto filed an Other lawsuit against Patrina Scotto. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Giaquinto

Defendants

Patrina Scotto

Anthony Scotto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ESKENASI, LEIGH DAVID

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF LOUIS GRANDELLI, P.C.

GRANDELLI, LOUIS

Attorney at Law Offices of Lou Grandelli

Defendant Attorney

VALENTI, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at CHEVEN KEELY & HATZIS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grandelli, L.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Patrina Scotto

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Patrina Scotto; Filed By: Grandelli, L.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Anthony Scotto

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Anthony Scotto; Filed By: Grandelli, L.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Grandelli, L.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grandelli, L.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Patrina Scotto; Filed By: Grandelli, L.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Anthony Scotto; Filed By: Grandelli, L.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Grandelli, L.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less