Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 04/14/2020 at 13:05:19 (UTC).

NICOLA IZZO - v. - SMITELL SPONSOR LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 NICOLA IZZO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SMITELL SPONSOR LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicola Izzo

Defendants

SHANGHAI MUNICIPAL INVESTMENT (GROUP) USA LLC.

SMITELL SPONSOR LLC

LEND LEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION LMB INC.

NORDSTROM, INC.

EXTELL MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

EXTELL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, MITCHELL R.

Attorney at WINGATE RUSSOTTI SHAPIRO & HALPERIN, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

BROCCOLO, ANTHONY

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

KONG, DAVID W

Attorney at ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN & BENTLEY

KRASOVITSKAYA, ROKSOLANA

Attorney at Ingram Yuzek Gainen Carroll & Bertolotti, LLP

BECKERMAN, JASON L

Attorney at ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN & BENTLEY

NOSS, THOMAS ANDREW

Attorney at Dopf P.C.

TARANGELO, LAUREN ADELE

Attorney at Wade Clark Mulcahy

 

Court Documents

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Kahn, M.; Filed: 04/06/2020; Received: 04/06/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

STIPULATION - OTHER

Stipulated and Agreed -Plaintiff's Motion Is Resolved

COURT NOTICE

Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Robert D. Kalish

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service/Blueback

EXHIBIT(S)

Email - defense counsel

ANSWER (AMENDED)

Second Amended Verified Answer

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

ANSWER (AMENDED)

Amended Verified Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

Demand for BP, Notice to Take Deposition and Combined Discovery Demands

ANSWER

Verified Answer

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons and Complaint

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Kahn, M.; Filed: 04/06/2020; Received: 04/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #002) Stipulated and Agreed -Plaintiff's Motion Is Resolved; Filed By: Kahn, M.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE (Motion #002) Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Robert D. Kalish; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service/Blueback; Filed By: Kahn, M.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Email - defense counsel; Filed By: Kahn, M.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) *Corrected* Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Kahn, M.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sherman, M.; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Second Amended Verified Answer; Filed By: Sherman, M.; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tarangelo, L. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Tarangelo, L. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sherman, M.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Verified Answer; Filed By: Sherman, M.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Beckerman, J.; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for BP, Notice to Take Deposition and Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Beckerman, J.; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Beckerman, J.; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Kahn, M.; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less