This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:09:27 (UTC).

NICK LEVENTIS - v. - ANNIE ZHENG et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 NICK LEVENTIS filed an Other lawsuit against ANNIE ZHENG. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nick Leventis

Defendants

Annie Zheng

Zhming Zhao

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYNECKI, SCOTT E

Attorney at RUBENSTEIN & RYNECKI ESQS

Defendant Attorney

VEGLIANTE, GARY ERNEST

Attorney at Bilello and Associates

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Vegliante, G. - filed by James G Bilello & Associates; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STI P OF DISC

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STI P OF DISC; Filed By: Vegliante, G. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Vegliante, G. - filed by James G Bilello & Associates; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint to the def, Deidre Yvette Harrell

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint to the def, Deidre Yvette Harrell; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 11/21/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 11/21/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO-OL

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO-OL; Filed By: Vegliante, G. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO-OL; Filed By: Vegliante, G. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STI P OF DISC; Filed By: Vegliante, G. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 11/21/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Vegliante, G. - filed by James G Bilello & Associates; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Vegliante, G. - filed by James G Bilello & Associates; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint to the def, Deidre Yvette Harrell; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less