This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/24/2020 at 23:38:36 (UTC).

Nicholas Pasqualone - v. - New York Presbyterian Hospital et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 Nicholas Pasqualone filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against New York Presbyterian Hospital. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicholas Pasqualone

Defendants

Turner Construction Company

New York Presbyterian Hospital

Turner Construction-International LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZAREMBA, JOHN D

MASCOLO, MARK L

PAPAIN, THOMAS THEODORE

Defendant Attorneys

SPARLING, JOHN E

KALLFA, EVIS

MANASHIROV, ISAAK

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Zaremba, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2018; Received: 07/12/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2018; Received: 07/12/2018

ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #001)

ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Zaremba, J.; Filed: 03/23/2018; Received: 03/23/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) answer; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) summons and complaint; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) affirmation in support of motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) affirmation in support of motion; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) affirmation of good faith

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) affirmation of good faith; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) notice of motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) notice of motion; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of service

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of service; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

AFFIDAVIT S&C served on NY Presbyterian Hospital

AFFIDAVIT S&C served on NY Presbyterian Hospital; Filed By: Zaremba, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT summons & complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT summons & complaint; Filed By: Zaremba, J.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Zaremba, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2018; Received: 07/12/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2018; Received: 07/12/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Zaremba, J.; Filed: 03/23/2018; Received: 03/23/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/21/2018; Received: 03/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) demands; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) answer; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) summons and complaint; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) affirmation in support of motion; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) affirmation of good faith; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) notice of motion; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of service; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT S&C served on NY Presbyterian Hospital; Filed By: Zaremba, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT summons & complaint; Filed By: Zaremba, J.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less