Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 17:40:23 (UTC).

NIAGARA'S CHOICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. JOHN D MAZZOCCHI

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 NIAGARA'S CHOICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN D MAZZOCCHI. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIAGARAS CHOICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

John D Mazzocchi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIN, MARK H

Attorney at LACY KATZEN LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of additional mailing

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of additional mailing; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A military status

EXHIBIT(S) - A military status; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 04/10/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 04/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFF OF SERVICE - JOHN D. MAZZOCCHI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFF OF SERVICE - JOHN D. MAZZOCCHI; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - John D Mazzocch

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - John D Mazzocch; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of additional mailing; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A military status; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 04/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFF OF SERVICE - JOHN D. MAZZOCCHI; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - John D Mazzocch; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less