Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 14:19:30 (UTC).

NGM INSURANCE COMPANY - v. - CAVO BUILDERS' SUPPLIERS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 NGM INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CAVO BUILDERS' SUPPLIERS, INC. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1369

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGM INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

CAVO BUILDERS' SUPPLIERS, INC.

Francis Jakubowski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRILL, HAYDN JULIAN

Attorney at BRILL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

REICHARDT, COREY MARC

Attorney at BRILL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

FITZGIBBON, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

SMITH, THOMAS R

Attorney at BOND, SCHOENECK & KING, PLLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Settlement Agreement, Order and Mutual Release

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Settlement Agreement, Order and Mutual Release; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/23/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER Approve Settlement & Release

RJI -RE: OTHER Approve Settlement & Release; Filed By: Brill, H.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Settlement Agreement & Release

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Settlement Agreement & Release; Filed By: Brill, H.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Filed By: Fitzgibbon, T.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Fitzgibbon, T.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

ANSWER Cavo Builders' Supplies, Inc. Verified Answer

ANSWER Cavo Builders' Supplies, Inc. Verified Answer; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Reichardt, C.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Settlement Agreement, Order and Mutual Release; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Approve Settlement & Release; Filed By: Brill, H.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Settlement Agreement & Release; Filed By: Brill, H.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Filed By: Fitzgibbon, T.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Fitzgibbon, T.; Filed: 01/08/2018; Received: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Cavo Builders' Supplies, Inc. Verified Answer; Filed By: Smith, T.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Reichardt, C.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less