This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 08:14:29 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING v. JOEL STARLEY et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOEL STARLEY. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0358

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

Gerik Dobish

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Joel Starley

Brian Starley

In the Complaint Described

COMMISSIONER OF LABOR OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #12, THE LAST TWELVE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS AND UNK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

MACK, JARED RICHARD

Attorney at LEVENE, GOULDIN & THOMPSON LLP

BAZILE, BESSIE

Attorney at Employment Security Bureau

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Waiver in Foreclosure

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Waiver in Foreclosure; Filed By: Mack, J.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service- Brian Starley

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service- Brian Starley; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-COMMISSIONER OF LABOR OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-COMMISSIONER OF LABOR OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of mailing- Any and All

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of mailing- Any and All; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service- New York State Department of Labor

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service- New York State Department of Labor; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bazile, B.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT NOT REQUIRED

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT NOT REQUIRED; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Waiver in Foreclosure; Filed By: Mack, J.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service- Brian Starley; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-COMMISSIONER OF LABOR OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of mailing- Any and All; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service- New York State Department of Labor; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bazile, B.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT NOT REQUIRED; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less