Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 22:35:00 (UTC).

New York Housing Authority et al - v. - Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 New York Housing Authority filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Blue Sea Construction Company, LLC

Oceanhill, LLC

HP PPN Housing Development Fund Company, Inc.

New York Housing Authority

Blue Sea Development Company, LLC

PPD Partners , LLC

Defendants

Nicole Daversa

A&R Electrical Maintenance

Joseph Daversa

Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BUNDOCK, THOMAS HERBERT

Attorney at McMahon, Martine & Gallagher, LLP

SHOWERS, ANDREW DOWNING

Attorney at MCMAHON, MARTINE & GALLAGHER, LLP

REID, AOIFE

Attorney at McMahon, Martine & Gallagher

Defendant Attorneys

MARINO, SALVATORE LOUIS

O'MALLEY, MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin P. Westerman

ZIOLKOWSKI, SARAH M

Attorney at MILBER MAKRIS PLOUSADIS & SEIDEN, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal/ Info Stmt/ Notice of Entry & Cert of Serv

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal/ Info Stmt/ Notice of Entry & Cert of Serv; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Showers, A.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/30/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Rule 130

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Rule 130; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Document List

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Document List; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Consolidated Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Consolidated Order; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Bundock, T.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) SNIC policy

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) SNIC policy; Filed By: Bundock, T.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

ANSWER Answer to A&R's Counter-Claims and Demand for BP as to Counter-Claims

ANSWER Answer to A&R's Counter-Claims and Demand for BP as to Counter-Claims; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Harleysville's Answer upon A&R Electrical

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Harleysville's Answer upon A&R Electrical; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

ANSWER Answer of Harleysville

ANSWER Answer of Harleysville; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Marino, S.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

COMPLAINT Complaint for Declaratory Judgment

COMPLAINT Complaint for Declaratory Judgment; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal/ Info Stmt/ Notice of Entry & Cert of Serv; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Showers, A.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Rule 130; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Document List; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Consolidated Order; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Bundock, T.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) SNIC policy; Filed By: Bundock, T.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) post EBT demands and responses; Filed By: Bundock, T.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to A&R's Counter-Claims and Demand for BP as to Counter-Claims; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Harleysville's Answer upon A&R Electrical; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer of Harleysville; Filed By: Ziolkowski, S.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Marino, S.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint for Declaratory Judgment; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Muludiang, C.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less