This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:13:46 (UTC).

NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC - v. - THOMAS O ALEXANDER et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THOMAS O ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC d/b/a SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY REGISTER

KINGS COUNTY CLERK

Lucia Alexander

KINGS COUNTY SHERIFF

Thomas O Alexander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINKELSTEIN, EDWARD RICHARD

Attorney at FINKELSTEIN FILLER LLP

Defendant Attorney

COCARIU, DACIA C

Attorney at New York City Law Department

 

Court Documents

ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION

ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #1); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

ORDER - OTHER dtd 1/29/18

ORDER - OTHER dtd 1/29/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Cocariu, D.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Cocariu, D.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AMENDED AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AMENDED AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finkelstein, E. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 2013 Deed Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 2013 Deed Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 2004 Mortgage Satisfaction

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 2004 Mortgage Satisfaction; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 2013 Note and Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 2013 Note and Mortgage; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 2004 Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 2004 Mortgage; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 1985 Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 1985 Deed; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDING CAPTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #1); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 1/29/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Cocariu, D.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Cocariu, D.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AMENDED AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Finkelstein, E. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finkelstein, E. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 2013 Deed Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 2004 Mortgage Satisfaction; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 2013 Note and Mortgage; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 2004 Mortgage; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 1985 Deed; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Verified Complaint; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Finkelstein, E.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less