Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 23:02:06 (UTC).

New City Funding Corp. - v. - Michael Doyle

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 New City Funding Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Doyle. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

New City Funding Corp.

Defendant

Michael Doyle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIN, MARK H

Attorney at LACY KATZEN LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY STATUS

EXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY STATUS; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1)

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of additional mailing

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of additional mailing; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of service; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Military status

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Military status; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Complaint with Verification and Supporting Documentation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Complaint with Verification and Supporting Documentation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY STATUS; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of additional mailing; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of service; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Military status; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Complaint with Verification and Supporting Documentation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less