This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 06:03:30 (UTC).

NELSON PAULINO - v. - RICHARD WATKINS-JONES

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 NELSON PAULINO filed an Other lawsuit against RICHARD WATKINS-JONES. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kurtz, Jcp. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kurtz, Jcp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nelson Paulino

Defendant

Richard Watkins-jones

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLERSTEIN, HEDVA

Attorney at HEDVA WELLERSTEIN

Defendant Attorney

SPENCER, KEVIN JOSEPH

Attorney at ROE & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #1) Joined with 523999/2017 d/d 01/16/2019

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #1) Joined with 523999/2017 d/d 01/16/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) COURT ORDERS

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) COURT ORDERS; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) RICHARD JONES TRANSCRIPT

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) RICHARD JONES TRANSCRIPT; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) MOTION FOR JOINT TRIAL AND DISCOVERY

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) MOTION FOR JOINT TRIAL AND DISCOVERY; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) NOTE OF ISSUE

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) PLEADINGS

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) PLEADINGS; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

ORDER - OTHER dated 11/8/2018

ORDER - OTHER dated 11/8/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 11/11/2018; Received: 11/11/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 11/11/2017; Received: 11/11/2017

ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER, DEMAND FOR VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS, DEMAND FOR INFORMATION, DEMAND FOR WITNESS ... show more

ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER, DEMAND FOR VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS, DEMAND FOR INFORMATION, DEMAND FOR WITNESS ... show more; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #1) Joined with 523999/2017 d/d 01/16/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) COURT ORDERS; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) RICHARD JONES TRANSCRIPT; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) MOTION FOR JOINT TRIAL AND DISCOVERY; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) PLEADINGS; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) AFFIRMATIN IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTIN FOR JOINT TRIAL AND DISCOVERY; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 11/8/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 11/11/2018; Received: 11/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 11/11/2017; Received: 11/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER, DEMAND FOR VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS, DEMAND FOR INFORMATION, DEMAND FOR WITNESS ... show more; Filed By: Spencer, K.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less