This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 17:51:38 (UTC).

Nelly Burke v. John Brant

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Nelly Burke filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against John Brant. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is William K Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0193

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

William K Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nelly Burke

Defendant

John Brant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SKIVINGTON, PETER K.

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter K. Skivington

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, KEITH DOUGLAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KEITH D. MILLER

 

Court Documents

ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING

ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/25/2020

TRIAL / HEARING MINUTES Trial Minutes

TRIAL / HEARING MINUTES Trial Minutes; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING

ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

ADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketJUROR LIST; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL / HEARING MINUTES Trial Minutes; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Skivington, P.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less