This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 12:28:20 (UTC).

NEIL R KAFKO et al v. NEPTUNE I INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 NEIL R KAFKO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NEPTUNE I INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathy King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kathy King

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Neil R Kafko

Donna M Kafko

Defendants

NEPTUNE I INC.

Kalvin Lee

ASSOCIATED INDEMNITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHNITZER, HOWARD BRUCE

Attorney at Kafko Schnitzer, LLP

Defendant Attorney

FERLAND, PAUL CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Stipulation Adjourning Defendant Associated Indemnity Companys Motion to Dismiss to January 22, 2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Stipulation Adjourning Defendant Associated Indemnity Companys Motion to Dismiss to January 22, 2020; Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Amended Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Summons & Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Policy

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Policy; Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mailing - Def. CHUBB

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mailing - Def. CHUBB; Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Aff of Svc-Def. CHUBB

EXHIBIT(S) - A Aff of Svc-Def. CHUBB; Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIRMATION BCL307

AFFIRMATION BCL307; Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Stipulation Adjourning Defendant Associated Indemnity Companys Motion to Dismiss to January 22, 2020; Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Policy; Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ferland, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Mailing - Def. CHUBB; Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Aff of Svc-Def. CHUBB; Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION BCL307; Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Schnitzer, H.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less